Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme-Michel-Francis Martin, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Berbérati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1941BornLa Chapelle, France
26 Jun 196625.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jun 196726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Oct 198746.3AppointedBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic
24 Jan 198846.6Ordained BishopBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic
17 Jun 199150.0ResignedBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic
4 Dec 200968.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Berbérati, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Jérôme-Michel-Francis Martin:
Bishop Jérôme-Michel-Francis Martin O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Berbérati

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,609
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013