Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André-Georges Bontems

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1910Born
15 Apr 193322.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 196050.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
30 Nov 196050.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
26 Apr 196655.9AppointedArchbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
14 May 198575.0RetiredArchbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
3 Mar 198877.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for André-Georges Bontems
Archbishop André-Georges Bontems (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlombières

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018