Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Georges Joseph Lecrosnier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belfort-Montbéliard


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1923BornMaupertuis
20 Dec 194724.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 196946.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
21 Apr 196946.0AppointedTitular Bishop of San Leone
21 Jun 196946.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of San Leone
3 Nov 197956.5AppointedBishop of Belfort-Montbéliard, France
1 Mar 200076.8RetiredBishop of Belfort-Montbéliard, France
15 Oct 201390.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Belfort-Montbéliard, France

MicroData Summary for Eugène Georges Joseph Lecrosnier:
Bishop Eugène Georges Joseph Lecrosnier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belfort-Montbéliard

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 15 Oct 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 21 May 2015