Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Pierre Charles Schockert

Bishop Emeritus of Belfort-Montbéliard


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1940 BornFoug
29 Jun 196525.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 200060.0AppointedBishop of Belfort-Montbéliard, France
14 May 200060.3Ordained BishopBishop of Belfort-Montbéliard, France
21 May 201575.3RetiredBishop of Belfort-Montbéliard, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Pierre Charles Schockert:
Bishop Claude Pierre Charles Schockert (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Belfort-Montbéliard

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belfort-Montbéliard.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,765
  • r: Bollettino, 21 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015