Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Marie Joseph Blanchet, Ist. del Prado

Bishop of Créteil, France

Prelate of Mission de France o Pontigny


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1966 Born
20 Jun 199832.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Angers, France
27 Jun 199933.3Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
21 May 201549.2AppointedBishop of Belfort-Montbéliard, France
12 Jul 201549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Belfort-Montbéliard, France
9 Jan 202154.9AppointedBishop of Créteil, France
28 Feb 202155.0InstalledBishop of Créteil, France
21 May 202559.2AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
12 Jul 202559.4InstalledPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France

MicroData Summary
Dominique Marie Joseph Blanchet
Bishop Dominique Marie Joseph Blanchet Ist. del Prado
(born )
Bishop of Créteil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCholet, Diocese of Angers
Ordained BishopSaint-Joseph, Church, Belfort, Diocese of Belfort-Montbéliard

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Créteil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2015
  • od/ob/c1: CB, 21 May 2015
  • mn: CB, 29 May 2015
  • c2+: CB, 25 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,546
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2021
  • i: AM, 17 Jan 2021
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 May 2025
  • i: CB, 21 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 21 May 2025