Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Pierre Marie Orchampt

Bishop Emeritus of Angers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1923 BornVesoul
29 Jun 194824.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 197147.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
14 Jun 197147.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
18 Sep 197147.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
5 Jul 197450.6AppointedBishop of Angers, France
20 Mar 200076.3RetiredBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Pierre Marie Orchampt:
Bishop Jean Pierre Marie Orchampt (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Angers

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Angers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 May 2014