Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean Pelletier

Bishop-Elect of Mende, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1963 Born
26 Jun 199431.2Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
20 May 202562.1AppointedBishop of Mende, France
7 Sep 202562.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary
Jean Pelletier
Father Jean Pelletier
(born )
Bishop-Elect of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Sulpice, Diocese of Angers
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame-et-Saint Privat, Cathedral Basilica, Mende, Diocese of Mende

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Mende.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2025
  • ob: CB, 20 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025