Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benoît Comlan Messan Alowonou

Bishop of Kpalimé, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1949 Born
28 Jul 198435.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 200152.3AppointedBishop of Kpalimé, Togo
29 Sep 200152.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kpalimé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Benoît Comlan Messan Alowonou
Bishop Benoît Comlan Messan Alowonou (born ) Bishop of Kpalimé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTsévié

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kpalimé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,057

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018