Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope John XXIII

Bl. Angelo Giuseppe Roncalli

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


from the web site of the diocese

from the web site of the diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1881BornSotto il Monte
10 Aug 190422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
3 Mar 192543.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Areopolis
19 Mar 192543.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Areopolis
19 Mar 192543.3AppointedOfficial to Bulgaria
16 Oct 193149.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bulgaria
30 Nov 193453.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mesembria
30 Nov 193453.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Turkey
30 Nov 193453.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Greece
22 Dec 194463.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
12 Jan 195371.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
12 Jan 195371.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 195371.1AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
28 Oct 195876.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Nov 195876.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Jun 196381.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Sep 2000Beatified
27 Apr 2014Canonized

MicroData Summary for Bl. Angelo Giuseppe Roncalli:
Holy Father Bl. Angelo Giuseppe Roncalli (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 17
  • cano: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 21 Jan 2014