Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Yoshimatsu Noguchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hiroshima, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1909Born
26 Mar 193929.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 195950.1AppointedBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
8 May 196050.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
29 Mar 198575.4RetiredBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
9 Nov 199788.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hiroshima, Japan

MicroData Summary for Dominic Yoshimatsu Noguchi
Bishop Dominic Yoshimatsu Noguchi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hiroshima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagasaki

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018