Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Olivotti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Samos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1905Born
21 Jul 192923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
10 Feb 195751.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
10 Feb 195751.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
19 Mar 195751.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
9 Mar 197468.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Olivotti
Bishop Giuseppe Olivotti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast