Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Baldelli

Deceased

President of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Bishop of Aperlae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1886BornPergola
26 Jul 190922.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 195972.8AppointedPresident of the Roman Curia - Other
22 Jul 195972.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aperlae
25 Oct 195973.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aperlae
20 Jul 196376.8DiedPresident of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Baldelli:
Bishop Ferdinando Baldelli (born , died ) President of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015