Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcello Cardinal Mimmi

Deceased

Secretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1882BornPoggio di Castel San Pietro
23 Dec 190523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
30 Jun 193047.9AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
25 Jul 193048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
31 Jul 193351.0AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
30 Aug 195270.1AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
12 Jan 195370.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195370.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
15 Dec 195775.4AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
9 Jun 195875.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
6 Mar 196178.6DiedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

MicroData Summary for Marcello Mimmi:
Cardinal Marcello Mimmi (born , died ) Secretary of Sacred Consistorial Congregation

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
  • a cardinal for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013