Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Falconieri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Conversano, Italy

Titular Bishop of Silli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1885Born
19 Dec 190823.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 193550.5AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
1 Dec 193550.7Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
24 May 196479.2RetiredBishop of Conversano, Italy
24 May 196479.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Silli
28 Nov 196479.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Falconieri
Bishop Gregorio Falconieri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Conversano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNardò

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • r: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 56, Page 462
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 92
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,493

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018