Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1873Born
19 Sep 189623.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jan 191238.8AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
28 Apr 191239.1Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
15 Aug 191239.4InstalledBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
30 Apr 192451.1AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
7 Dec 192855.7AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
2 Aug 195077.3DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Costa
Bishop Alberto Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Croce di Zilbello

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,912, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast