Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Francesco Crotti, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1874Born
20 Mar 193358.8AppointedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
23 Apr 193358.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
25 Jul 193460.2DiedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Francesco Crotti
Bishop Maurizio Francesco Crotti O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Cittą di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla di Serio
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Death PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,934
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,935
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,933, Number 20
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 567
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast