Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Cazzani

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1867Born
1 Nov 188922.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 190437.4AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
28 Aug 190437.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
19 Dec 191447.7AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
25 May 194477.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cremona, Italy
26 Aug 195285.4DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Cazzani
Archbishop Giovanni Cazzani (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSamperone

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 145, and Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017