Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Bongiorni

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brescia

Titular Bishop of Sasima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1864BornLovere
26 Mar 188722.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 191651.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
31 Jan 191651.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasima
20 Mar 191651.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasima
18 May 193773.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Bongiorni:
Bishop Emilio Bongiorni (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brescia

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013