Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacinto Tredici, Obl. Ss. A. C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Oblati dei Ss. Ambrogio e Carlo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1880Born
23 Nov 190222.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 193353.5AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
6 Jan 193453.6Ordained BishopBishop of Brescia, Italy
15 Dec 195878.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Brescia, Italy
19 Aug 196484.2DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Tredici
Archbishop Giacinto Tredici Obl. Ss. A. C. (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 May 2018

Quantcast