Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Almici

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1904BornZone
2 Jun 192824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
24 Apr 196157.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
24 Apr 196157.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadia
28 May 196157.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadia
17 Jan 196560.9AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
17 Jul 198076.4RetiredBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
24 Sep 198581.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Almici:
Bishop Giuseppe Almici (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013