Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Bosetti

Deceased

Bishop of Fidenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1901Born
6 Jan 192422.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 195150.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
4 Nov 195150.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
6 Jan 195250.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
29 Mar 196159.7AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
1 Aug 196261.1DiedBishop of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Bosetti
Bishop Guglielmo Bosetti (born , died ) Bishop of Fidenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiari

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018