Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Kazimierz Zdzitowiecki

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1854Born
16 Jul 187622.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Jul 187622.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 190248.3AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
23 Nov 190248.7Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
11 Feb 192772.9DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Kazimierz Zdzitowiecki
Bishop Stanisław Kazimierz Zdzitowiecki (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarczkowicze

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 594
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016