Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Władysław Paweł Krynicki

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1861Born
1885²23.5Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
29 Jul 191857.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
29 Jul 191857.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Achantus
10 Nov 191857.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achantus
21 Nov 192766.3AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
7 Dec 192867.4DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Władysław Paweł Krynicki
Bishop Władysław Paweł Krynicki (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWłocławek

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 34
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017