Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Felix Cardinal von Hartmann

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1851BornMünster
19 Dec 187423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
6 Jun 191159.5SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
27 Jul 191159.6ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
26 Oct 191159.9Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
29 Oct 191260.9SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
2 Dec 191261.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Apr 191361.3InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 May 191462.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 191462.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
11 Nov 191967.9DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Felix von Hartmann:
Cardinal Felix von Hartmann (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
  • a cardinal for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 82
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 257
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013