Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Wolf, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Byblus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1876BornBorbeck, Germany
5 Feb 189923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
16 Mar 191438.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Togo
16 Mar 191438.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
28 Jun 191438.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
Jan 1921³44.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Togo
24 Nov 192246.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea
23 Feb 194468.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Wolf:
Bishop Franz Wolf S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013