Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Madang

Archidioecesis Madanganus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stephen Joseph Reichert, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop
  • William Joseph Kurtz, S.V.D., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Benedict To Varpin, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land
24 February 1896ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land
25 July 1913SplitPrefecture Apostolic of Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea
23 November 1922ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Eastern Kaiser-Wilhelms-Land Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea
Vicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen
15 May 1952Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea Vicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen
18 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen
Vicariate Apostolic of Wewak
Vicariate Apostolic of Mount Hagen (erected)
18 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen Vicariate Apostolic of Lae (erected)
18 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen Vicariate Apostolic of Goroka (erected)
Archdiocese of Madang
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen Archdiocese of Madang

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Madang
197057,037162,71735.1%551561,018783624ap1971
198074,900226,00033.1%541461,628707127ap1981
199095,287269,00035.4%748551,732876428ap1991
1999128,224283,15445.3%1222343,771579529ap2000
2000138,494283,15448.9%1222344,0732579529ap2001
2001138,494283,15448.9%1222344,073315828ap2002
2002139,956283,15449.4%1222344,116305828ap2003
2003140,000283,15449.4%1327403,500335828ap2004
2004142,000285,15449.8%1425393,641315628ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 20 Sep 2013