Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Joseph Kurtz, S.V.D.

Archbishop Emeritus of Madang, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1935 Born
28 Jan 196226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Jun 198247.0AppointedBishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea
8 Sep 198247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea
15 Oct 199964.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
24 Jul 200166.1SucceededArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea
30 Nov 201075.5RetiredArchbishop of Madang, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Kurtz
Archbishop William Joseph Kurtz S.V.D. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKepa, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Madang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast