Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Drzazga

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1914Born
3 Oct 193824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
5 May 195843.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
5 May 195843.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Siniandus
31 Aug 195844.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siniandus
25 May 196752.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
28 Jun 197257.9AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
12 Sep 197864.1DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Drzazga (VIAF: 315523482)
Bishop Józef Drzazga (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolica
Ordained BishopSt. Jacques, Pro-Cathedral, Olsztyn

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,588

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Aug 2020

Quantcast