Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Wilczyński

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Warmia (Ermland)

Titular Bishop of Polybotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1903BornParczew, Poland
1 Aug 192622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
12 Jun 195248.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
12 Jun 195248.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Polybotus
29 Jun 195248.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polybotus
1 Dec 195653.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
26 Dec 195653.3InstalledApostolic Administrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
5 Aug 196561.9DiedApostolic Administrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Wilczyński:
Bishop Tomasz Wilczyński (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013