Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Wysocki

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Elbląg, Poland

Titular Bishop of Praecausa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1940 Born
13 Jun 196524.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 198948.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
6 Apr 198948.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Praecausa
29 Apr 198948.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Praecausa
25 Mar 199251.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Elbląg, Poland
31 Oct 201575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Elbląg, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Wysocki
Bishop Józef Wysocki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Elbląg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJartypory

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Elbląg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,664
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast