Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wacław Żyliński

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1803BornMerecz
24 May 182522.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Apr 182623.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 184845.4AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 Dec 184845.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
18 Sep 185653.6AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
5 May 186360.2DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Wacław Żyliński:
Archbishop Wacław Żyliński (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 390, and Page 591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013