Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Pieńkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lublin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1786BornModliborzyce
30 Jul 180923.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185266.2AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
31 Jul 185367.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lublin, Poland
21 Nov 186377.3DiedBishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Pieńkowski:
Bishop Vincenzo Pieńkowski (born , died ) Bishop of Lublin

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013