Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacy Hołowiński

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev, Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1807³Born
7 Jul 183022.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Sep 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 184840.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
3 Jul 184840.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
30 Nov 184841.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
24 Jan 185143.3SucceededArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
7 Oct 185548.0DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Hołowiński (VIAF: 68772237)
Archbishop Ignacy Hołowiński (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOwrucz, Diocese of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
Ordained BishopSainte Catherine, St. Petersburg

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 186, and Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast