Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Górski

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1784BornGródek
4 Sep 181025.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jan 181126.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 185368.7AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
2 Jul 185469.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
15 Dec 185571.1DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Górski (VIAF: 301619190)
Bishop Mikołaj Górski (born , died ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016