Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adamus Wojtkiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Minsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1796BornVilnae
9 Mar 181923.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Mar 181923.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 185256.1AppointedBishop of Minsk, Belarus
11 Jan 185356.9Ordained BishopBishop of Minsk, Belarus
23 Dec 186973.9DiedBishop of Minsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Adamus Wojtkiewicz:
Bishop Adamus Wojtkiewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Minsk

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013