Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton Fiałkowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1797³BornNowy-Lepel
17 Apr 182426.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 May 182427.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 185861.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
25 Jun 185861.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thennesus
24 Oct 185861.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thennesus
23 Mar 186062.8AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
23 Feb 187274.7AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
11 Feb 188385.7DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Fiałkowski:
Archbishop Anton Fiałkowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 175, and Page 390
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 544

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Sep 2014