Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Maksymilian Staniewski, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mohilev, Belarus

Titular Bishop of Plataea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1795Born
31 Oct 181217.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
29 May 181823.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
31 May 181823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Sep 185863.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
27 Sep 185863.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Plataea
20 Feb 185963.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plataea
1869²73.6RemovedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
11 Dec 187176.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mohilev, Belarus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Maksymilian Staniewski
Bishop Józef Maksymilian Staniewski O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosienie
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St Petersburg

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 458
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017