Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Isawzkiewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mohilev

Titular Bishop of Anthedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1819BornAdomajcie
14 Apr 184526.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 187253.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
6 May 187253.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
30 Jun 187253.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
9 Jan 187656.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Isawzkiewicz:
Bishop Jerzy Isawzkiewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013