Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Teofil Kuliński

Deceased

Bishop of Kielce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1823Born
12 Aug 184925.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187248.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
23 Feb 187248.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
3 Oct 187248.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
15 Mar 188359.2AppointedBishop of Kielce, Poland
8 Jan 190783.0DiedBishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Teofil Kuliński
Bishop Tomasz Teofil Kuliński (born , died ) Bishop of Kielce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEzmielow, Diocese of Sandomierz
Ordained BishopSt. Petersburg

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,583
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 329, and Page 503
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017