Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Józef Wnorowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lublin, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1818Born
19 Jul 184022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Jun 184123.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188364.9AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
20 May 188365.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lublin, Poland
20 Apr 188567.0DiedBishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Józef Wnorowski (VIAF: 162314301)
Bishop Kazimierz Józef Wnorowski (born , died ) Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLęczyca
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St Petersbourg

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 349
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,864
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017