Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Johann Zerr

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiraspol, Moldova

Titular Bishop of Salona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1849Born
11 Mar 187223.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188334.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
15 Mar 188334.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
3 Jun 188334.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
30 Dec 188940.8AppointedBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
6 Jun 190253.2ResignedBishop of Tiraspol, Moldova
23 Nov 192576.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
15 Dec 193283.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiraspol, Moldova

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Anton Johann Zerr (VIAF: 195611757)
Bishop Anton Johann Zerr (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiraspol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFranzfeld, Diocese of Tiraspol
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, Sankt Peterburg

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,790
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 246, and Page 556
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017