Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Franciszek Audziewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1834Born
22 Mar 185823.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Apr 185924.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188955.2AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
28 Apr 189055.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
10 Jun 189560.7DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Antoni Franciszek Audziewicz (VIAF: 315560604)
Bishop Antoni Franciszek Audziewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTelzy, Diocese of Vilnius
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St. Petersbourg

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 591
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017