Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek di Paolo Pawłowski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1775³BornCzersk
2 Feb 180024.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
12 Apr 180025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
9 Apr 182752.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
9 Apr 182752.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dulma
27 May 182752.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dulma
21 May 182954.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Płock, Poland
6 Feb 183660.8SucceededBishop of Płock, Poland
6 Jul 185277.2DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek di Paolo Pawłowski (VIAF: 315212275)
Bishop Franciszek di Paolo Pawłowski (born , died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 310, and Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016