Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wojciech Jozef Skarszewski

Deceased

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1743BornJanow
21 Jul 177632.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 179047.1AppointedBishop of Chełm and Lublin, Poland
6 Feb 179147.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm and Lublin, Poland
23 Sep 180561.9AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
12 Jul 182480.7AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
12 Jun 182783.6DiedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Jozef Skarszewski:
Archbishop Wojciech Jozef Skarszewski (died ) Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 243, and Page 390
  • mn: CB, 19 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Sep 2014