Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Marceli Gutkowski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1776BornRaciąż
1798¹21.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1799¹22.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 182650.1AppointedBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
1 Oct 182650.3Ordained BishopBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
1856¹79.6ResignedBishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
18 Sep 185680.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
2 Oct 186387.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Marceli Gutkowski:
Archbishop Jan Marceli Gutkowski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 365
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 220
  • c34: CB, 19 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Sep 2014