Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franciszek Ksawery Wierzchlejski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1803BornPoręba
24 Feb 182622.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Jun 182622.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 184642.3SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
27 Jul 184642.7ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
4 Oct 184642.8Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
6 Dec 185956.0SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
23 Mar 186056.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
17 Apr 188480.4DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Ksawery Wierzchlejski:
Archbishop Franciszek Ksawery Wierzchlejski (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 339, and Page 469

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Mar 2014