Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Samuel Cyryl Stefanowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1755BornŁysiec
8 Jun 177823.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
26 Jul 177823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
27 Sep 183176.3SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
13 Mar 183276.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
1 Jul 183277.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
8 Dec 1858103.5DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Samuel Cyryl Stefanowicz:
Archbishop Samuel Cyryl Stefanowicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 80.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 19 May 2015