Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakub Stefan Augustynowicz

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1701³BornLeopoli
30 Dec 172524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
11 Feb 173735.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
11 Feb 173735.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aegae
5 May 173735.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aegae
22 Dec 175150.0SucceededArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
11 Jan 178381.0DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakub Stefan Augustynowicz:
Archbishop Jakub Stefan Augustynowicz (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 67, and Page 260
  • ob/s/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 15 Oct 2014