Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Tobiasz Augustynowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1664Born
26 Dec 168824.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
1 Apr 168924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
22 May 171348.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
22 May 171348.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Himeria
15 Jun 171550.5SucceededArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
22 Dec 175187.0DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Tobiasz Augustynowicz
Archbishop Jan Tobiasz Augustynowicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv

  • a priest for 62.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 221, and Page 243
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017