Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giorgio Maria Lascaris, C.R. †

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1706BornVerona
1724¹17.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
30 Jan 172923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Apr 174135.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
29 Jun 174135.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
22 Jul 175448.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
20 Dec 176256.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
11 Dec 179589.8DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Maria Lascaris:
Patriarch Giorgio Maria Lascaris C.R. (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 54.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,873
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 450, and Page 402
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 15 Oct 2014